TREETON MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It provides a welfare institute with facilities for physical recreation and other leisure time activities to improve the living conditions of the inhabitants of Treeton and the surrounding area. It possesses a bowling green plus a function/meeting room which is available for members and the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Rotherham
Governance
- 16 February 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENNIS WHYSALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Keith Smithhurst | Trustee | 02 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Graham Grant | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Kitteridge | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.27k | £23.46k | £45.66k | £77.42k | £44.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.08k | £112.30k | £70.77k | £57.18k | £62.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.38k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 December 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 December 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14TH OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A RECREATION GROUND AND WELFARE INSTITUTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE AREA BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TREETON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Arundel Street
Treeton
Rotherham
S60 5PW
- Phone:
- 07579001160
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window