Financial history THE POPPLETON COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 523984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £218.88k £202.10k £245.21k £279.80k £0
Total expenditure £214.47k £161.94k £184.95k £231.88k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £51.79k £36.93k N/A N/A