THE POPPLETON COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To run and maintain the Poppleton Community Centre and associated Sport and Leisure facilities for the benefit of the inhabitants of Upper and Nether Poppleton and the surrounding area.. Poppleton Junior Football Club, Poppleton Bowls Club, Poppleton United Football Club and Poppleton Cricket Club are subsidiary groups of the Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 March 1964: Standard registration
- POPPLETON COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- POPPLETON COMMUNITY CENTRE AND SPORTING FACILITIES (Working name)
- UPPER AND NETHER POPPLETON RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Michael Richardson | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allison Kim Campbell | Trustee | 17 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Lawson | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEMMA LAWSON | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lawer | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mike Walter | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tim Bowers | Trustee | 18 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
June Hardy | Trustee | 18 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CROME | Trustee | 11 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
WARWICK SPENCER | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALLEN JONES | Trustee | 21 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN TOMLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BOB WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £218.88k | £202.10k | £245.21k | £279.80k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.47k | £161.94k | £184.95k | £231.88k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £51.79k | £36.93k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 06/01/1998 AS AMENDED ON 11/10/2000 AS AMENDED ON 29/11/2001 AS AMENDED ON 30/10/2007 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2009
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE APB FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF UPPER POPPLETON AND NETHER POPPLETON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 MILLFIELD GARDENS
NETHER POPPLETON
YORK
YO26 6NZ
- Phone:
- 01904 781660
- Email:
- info@poppletoncentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window