YORKSHIRE MAIN MINERS WELFARE SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide sporting and social facilities for the community as a whole
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Doncaster
Governance
- 19 August 1964: Standard registration
- YORSHIRE MAIN MINERS WELFARE SCHEME (Working name)
- YORKSHIRE MAIN MINERS WELFARE RECREATION OR PLEASURE GROUND AND YOUTH CENTRE (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DONALD SIDES | Chair | 29 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Howells | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Garry Moseley | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph McAteer | Trustee | 24 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Wynne | Trustee | 28 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.35k | £42.57k | £72.82k | £173.47k | £56.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.72k | £38.04k | £88.08k | £65.79k | £70.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £38.93k | £5.02k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 December 2021 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 December 2021 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME 3RD SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF A RECREATION GROUND AND COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS (AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY) OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WARMSWORTH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yorkshire Main Miners Welfare Club
Edlington Lane
Edlington
DONCASTER
South Yorkshire
DN12 1DA
- Phone:
- 01709867400
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window