THE WHIXLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523992
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity's purpose is to provide a village hall for the inhabitants of Whixley and its surrounding villages with the object of enhancing their lives. The village hall combats loneliness and social isolation and enriches village life through its clubs and activities e.g. luncheon club, tots playgroup, annual pantomime and bonfire . In addition, it is home to the Women's Institute and local Cubs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022

Total income: £36,634
Total expenditure: £20,295

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 November 1963: Standard registration
  • 10 May 2023: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 10 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1200194 WHIXLEY VILLAGE HALL CIO
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE WHIXLEY PARISH INSTITUTE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £28.88k £89.86k £59.21k £29.92k £36.63k
Total expenditure £20.51k £80.16k £37.74k £34.08k £20.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £11.72k £700 £17.34k £11.60k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2022 14 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 14 July 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2021 28 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 28 July 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2020 23 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 23 November 2020 On Time