Financial history LLANGATHEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 524012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.82k £21.13k £2.82k £5.65k £8.67k
Total expenditure £5.78k £4.09k £12.23k £12.25k £10.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.65k N/A N/A N/A