Trustees LLANGATHEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 524012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hywel Humphreys Chair 22 November 2013
None on record
Brigid Loizou Trustee 04 February 2020
None on record
James Alexander Goodfellow Trustee 21 November 2016
None on record
Eirlys Mary Pugh Trustee 16 November 2015
None on record
Beryl Jones Trustee 04 November 2014
None on record
Gweneira Davies Trustee 10 February 2014
None on record
Tony Loizou Trustee 21 November 2013
None on record