Cross Hands Hall, Cinema and Community Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and operate a community centre where films, live stage shows and other group activities can be held for the purpose of promoting an enhancing greater awareness of community spirit and participation in community events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 27 April 1964: Standard registration
- CROSS HANDS PUBLIC HALL (Working name)
- LLANNON AND LLANARTHEY COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- LLANNON AND LLANARTHNEY COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE GREEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Anthony Paultyn | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Rhys Jenkins | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jerzy Stanislaw Bilski | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Jones | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Llinos Bilski | Trustee | 02 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Thomas | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.64k | £56.87k | £55.56k | £69.26k | £72.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.00k | £44.84k | £67.13k | £68.78k | £72.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £2.38k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.60k | £31.25k | £2.38k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 19.08.1976 as amended on 17 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITES OF LLANARTHEY AND LLANNON
Area of benefit
COMMUNITES OF LLANNON AND LLANARTHNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carmarthen Road
Cross Hands
Carmarthenshire
SA14 6SU
- Phone:
- 01269844441
- Website:
-
crosshands-hall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window