ACCESSIBLE LEARNING FOUNDATION LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Accessible Learning Foundation (ALF) provides support for neurodivergent children and adults within primary schools, prisons and the workplace, within England and Wales. This is achieved by funding screening programmes, teacher training, workshops, research and raising awareness by affecting national debate.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 September 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Louise Dixon | Chair | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Leigh Armitage | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julian Francis Hosking | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Claire Elizabeth Dixon | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Bloomfield | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 MAY 2022 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 JUL 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 JAN 2024 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN NEED BY REASON OF HAVING NEURODIVERGENT CONDITIONS WITHIN PRIMARY SCHOOLS, PRISONS AND THE WORKPLACE, WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES, INCLUDING BY PROVIDING HELP AND ASSISTANCE TO THOSE WHO SUPPORT THEM, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY; (A) PROVIDING SERVICES SUCH AS ONLINE SCREENING AND INTERVENTION PROGRAMMES TO PRIMARY SCHOOL AGED CHILDREN AND LEARNING COURSES TO TEACHERS THAT ENABLE THE EARLY IDENTIFICATION AND SUPPORT OF NEURODIVERGENT CONDITIONS WITHIN THE MAINSTREAM CLASSROOM, (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT OF NEURODIVERGENT PRISONERS BY WAY OF, BUT NOT LIMITED TO; SCHEMES AND INITIATIVES, TO INCREASE LITERACY WITHIN PRISONS AND REDUCE REOFFENDING RATES, (C) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE BY SUPPORTING BY WAY OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, GRANTS, FOR ACADEMIC RESEARCH INTO THE FIELD OF NEURODIVERGENT CONDITIONS AND ASSISTIVE TECHNOLOGY, (D) RAISING STANDARDS FOR NEURODIVERGENT CHILDREN, PRISONERS AND EMPLOYEES, BY AFFECTING NATIONAL DEBATE ON NEURODIVERGENT ISSUES WITHIN THE EDUCATION AND PENAL POLICIES OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND CALLING FOR BUSINESSES TO EFFECT REGULAR WHOLE STAFF TRAINING ON SUPPORTING THE NEURODIVERGENT WITHIN THE WORKPLACE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Frewin Road
LONDON
SW18 3LR
- Phone:
- 07884433059
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.