Trustees NORTHAMPTON STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1209212
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alastair Thomson Mr | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Oscar Chapman Mr | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMED HAFIZ KALLIVALAPPIL SAIDU MUHAMMED | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Arlina Mauree Dr | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Fajar Ajmal Butt | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Jason Sparkhall Mr | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|||||
ROSNA ROY | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Leanne Wilkins | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Hannah Templeman | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Paul Wood | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.