BLACK PARK COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a locally run community centre for the benefit of the local residents. The Church hold monthly services, green space for residents and local children. Fund raising events are held regularly and we have regular users of the centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 09 December 1963: Standard registration
- BLACK PARK MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PEARSON | Chair | 03 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.77k | £16.68k | £13.47k | £5.06k | £5.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.62k | £2.34k | £7.26k | £11.91k | £8.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 19 OCTOBER 1976
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF CHIRK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS,LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
COMMUNITY OF CHIRK AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hafan
Church Street
Pen-y-Cae
WREXHAM
LL14 2RL
- Phone:
- 01978840675
- Email:
- black_park@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window