Accounts and annual returns THE RUTHIN AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 524072
Charity reporting is overdue by 1433 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 337 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 337 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 703 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 703 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1068 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1068 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1433 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1433 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required