BEQUEST OF HANNAH JANE SMITH FOR A RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 524077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

VILLAGE PLAY AREA

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Denbighshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 May 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip John Barley FRSB Chair 14 November 2023
None on record
Nigel Bunton Trustee 08 October 2024
None on record
Julie Ann Burnage Trustee 14 November 2023
None on record
Julie Marie Johnson Trustee 14 November 2023
None on record
Sue Davidson Trustee 09 July 2019
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Tree House Cottage
Tremeirchion Road
Bodfari
DENBIGH
Clwyd
LL16 4EL
Phone:
+44 7791 505325