NEUROBETTER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote and protect the mental health of neurodivergent people for the public benefit by raising awareness and understanding among the general public of the specific challenges neurodivergent people experience in maintaining their mental health, and the increased risks they face and by providing a range of helpful tools, support, and information including online and through a mobile app.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 October 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Carol Owen | Chair | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Czeslaw Kuncewicz | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Henry Ainsworth | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Shereese Mason-Clemenz | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
NATHALIE LEE DULLAGE | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Beth Avery | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louis Philip Barnett | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Francis Inman | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 APR 2024 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 03 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROTECT AND ENHANCE THE MENTAL HEALTH OF NEURODIVERGENT PEOPLE BY OFFERING SUPPORT SERVICES, WITH THE AIM OF REDUCING THE IMPACT OF MENTAL HEALTH STRUGGLES, THE INCIDENCE OF SELF HARM AND OF SUICIDAL IDEATION. (2) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF NEURODIVERGENT PEOPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE SPECIFIC CHALLENGES NEURODIVERGENT PEOPLE EXPERIENCE IN MAINTAINING THEIR MENTAL HEALTH, AND THE INCREASED RISKS THEY FACE AND BY PROVIDING A RANGE OF HELPFUL TOOLS, SUPPORT, AND INFORMATION ONLINE AND THROUGH A MOBILE APP. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, NEURODIVERGENT PEOPLE MEANS PEOPLE WITH CONDITIONS SUCH AS DYSLEXIA, DYSPRAXIA, DYSCALCULIA AND DYSGRAPHIA, AUTISM, ADHD, TIC DISORDERS (SUCH AS TOURETTE’S), AND OTHER NEUROLOGICAL OR DEVELOPMENTAL CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ground Floor, Kings House
101-135 Kings Road
Brentwood
Essex
CM14 4DR
- Phone:
- 03001029069
- Email:
- team@neurobetter.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.