Trustees NEUROBETTER
Charity number: 1210347
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Carol Owen | Chair | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Czeslaw Kuncewicz | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Henry Ainsworth | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Shereese Mason-Clemenz | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
NATHALIE LEE DULLAGE | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Beth Avery | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Francis Inman | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.