Financial history KINNERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 524088
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £14.79k £13.80k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £16.40k £12.54k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.32k £1.76k N/A N/A N/A