Financial history CYMMAU SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 524091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.68k £13.60k £19.49k £9.73k £11.21k
Total expenditure £6.64k £2.45k £31.31k £9.87k £8.40k
Income from government contracts N/A £135 N/A N/A £215
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A