FRIENDS OF CASSIOBURY PARK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are dedicated to preserving and enhancing Cassiobury Park. We foster a harmonious balance between nature and community by organising conservation and educational events, fundraising for park improvements, and advocating for the parks ongoing success.
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 28 November 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Gratton Jenkins MSc | Chair | 15 July 2009 |
|
|
||||
Simonie Jeffree | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Siobhan Burke | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Blake | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Ira Thomas MA, MSc | Trustee | 15 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert Jakeman FCMA | Trustee | 15 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Barnes | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 NOV 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (1) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF CASSIOBURY CARK ('THE PARK') AS A PLACE OF HISTORIC AND ECOLOGICAL INTEREST AND BEAUTY; (2) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL PLANT, ANIMAL AND BIRD LIFE OF THE PARK; (3) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND OTHER ASPECTS OF THE PARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 LEAFORD CRESCENT
WATFORD
WD24 5JQ
- Phone:
- 07776241081
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.