Trustees BRENTWOOD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1208501
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Charles Rosam | Chair | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Francesca Austin | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Timmins | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lee Bass | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Stephen David Chandler | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Bernard Gurnett | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian James Kerr | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Kathleen Stuckey | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Victoria Griffiths | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Louise Pasquale | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Parish | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Parish | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paul McGrath | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Austin FCCA | Trustee | 12 June 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.