Financial history BRYNCYNON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 524123
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £27.94k £34.80k £13.80k £17.38k £5.28k
Total expenditure £26.32k £29.27k £20.09k £13.65k £12.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A