IGREJA BATISTA ATITUDE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH PRAYER MEETINGS, BIBLE STUDY GROUPS, AND FELLOWSHIP GATHERINGS, FACILITATING SPIRITUAL GROWTH AND SUPPORT NETWORKS. TO ORGANISE PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS SUCH AS EASTER AND CHRISTMAS, PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE COMMUNITY TO COME TOGETHER IN WORSHIP AND CELEBRATION
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 July 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARCIO Simionato Garcia | Chair | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
CLEYDIANE COELHO SOARES VESCOVI | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
VAGNER DE OLIVEIRA CAMPOS | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vinicius PESSOTTI MESSNER CAMPELO | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH PRAYER MEETINGS, BIBLE STUDY GROUPS, AND FELLOWSHIP GATHERINGS, FACILITATING SPIRITUAL GROWTH AND SUPPORT NETWORKS. TO ORGANISE PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS SUCH AS EASTER AND CHRISTMAS, PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE COMMUNITY TO COME TOGETHER IN WORSHIP AND CELEBRATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTH HOUSE 1, GROUND FLOOR
BOND AVENUE, MOUNT FARM
BLETCHLEY
MILTON KEYNES
MK1 1SW
- Phone:
- 07737294433
- Email:
- atitudeuk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.