Accounts and annual returns NANTYFFYLLON MINERS' INSTITUTE

Charity number: 524127
Charity reporting is up to date (118 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 February 2025 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required