HEOL-Y-CYW WELFARE INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 524146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Meeting Hall for Local People

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £10,756
Total expenditure: £14,732

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bridgend

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 April 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HEOL-Y-CYW WELFARE HALL (Working name)
  • HEOLYCYW WELFARE INSTITUTE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tracy Boxall Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
John Holmes Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Catherine Reape Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.33k £27.52k £7.23k £13.49k £10.76k
Total expenditure £11.29k £9.34k £7.72k £10.64k £14.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Welfare Hall
High Street
Heol Y Cyw
Bridgend
CF35 6HR
Phone:
07566218005
Website:

No information available