ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO

Charity number: 1210306
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Hillingdon
  • Kingston Upon Thames
  • Slough
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 October 2024: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • RSPCA HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IRENE Gwendoline HANSFORD Chair
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
Graham Martin Trustee 18 June 2020
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
Jill Correia Trustee 24 February 2020
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
SUSAN Mary BOON Trustee 29 October 2018
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
Andrew John LONGHURST Trustee 17 September 2018
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
Freda Elizabeth Longhurst Trustee 27 March 2017
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
HILLINGDON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)
Received: On time
JULIE ANN COLE Trustee
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
RSPCA
16-17 CRESCENT PARADE
UXBRIDGE ROAD
UXBRIDGE
UB10 0LG
Phone:
01895813263