Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO

Charity number: 1210306
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IRENE Gwendoline HANSFORD Chair
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
Graham Martin Trustee 18 June 2020
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
Jill Correia Trustee 24 February 2020
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
SUSAN Mary BOON Trustee 29 October 2018
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
Andrew John LONGHURST Trustee 17 September 2018
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
Freda Elizabeth Longhurst Trustee 27 March 2017
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time
HILLINGDON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)
Received: On time
JULIE ANN COLE Trustee
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time