Accounts and annual returns SEVEN SISTERS MINERS' WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 524159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 April 2025 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 April 2025 436 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 April 2025 801 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 April 2021 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required