THE FERNDALE AND DISTRICT BOYS' CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offering sporting and social activities to 7-25 year olds promoting equality of opportunity for young people to fulfill their potential to develop new skills encourage motivation and further develop existing skills to feel valued and listened to access to: positive role models and peer relationships evidencing pro social behavior and to have fun.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 17 March 1965: Standard registration
- FERNDALE AND DIST BOYS & GIRLS CLUB (Working name)
- FERNDALE BOYS CLUB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIM EVANS Mrs | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.89k | £3.35k | £735 | £0 | £2.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.91k | £5.19k | £1.44k | £2.83k | £2.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 August 2020 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST DECEMBER 1964
Charitable objects
BOYS' CLUB
Area of benefit
FERNDALE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 BRYNGOLEU CRESCENT
FERNDALE
CF43 4LT
- Phone:
- 01443730093
- Email:
- kimevans967@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window