CHARDET FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention and relief of poverty and the relief of those in need by reason of financial hardship or any other disadvantage for the benefit of individuals worldwide, through the provision of awarding grants to registered charities, community groups, non-profit organisations, non-governmental organisations and educational establishments. Supporting organizations carrying out projects
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Brighton And Hove
- Bristol City
- Cardiff
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Kent
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 29 July 2024: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dirk Chardet | Chair | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Byron Max Broadbent | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bill Stanford | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paola Andrea Jimenez Restrepo | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ana Patricia Restrepo Botero | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN AFRICA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, INDIVIDUALS IN NIGERIA, TOGO, AND GUINEA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church cottage, Much Birch
Hereford, Herefordshire
HR2 8HT
- Phone:
- 7375097764
- Email:
- galabernal@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.