Trustees LISVANE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 524175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Cann Chair 12 January 2020
LISVANE MEMORIAL HALL
Recently registered
Elizabeth Heaven Trustee 10 October 2023
LISVANE MEMORIAL HALL
Recently registered
David Allan Tooke Trustee 08 August 2023
LISVANE MEMORIAL HALL
Recently registered
Christine Ann Mahoney Trustee 07 March 2023
LISVANE MEMORIAL HALL
Recently registered
DR. CAROL HELEN BARRETT Trustee 13 February 2022
LISVANE MEMORIAL HALL
Recently registered
Susan Johnson Trustee 07 July 2019
LISVANE MEMORIAL HALL
Recently registered
Frederich John Rhoden Trustee 12 May 2019
LISVANE MEMORIAL HALL
Recently registered
MR CHRIS WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record