ALL SAINTS SPRINGFIELD PRE SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All Saints Pre School is based in the church hall at All Saints Church in Springfield, Chelmsford. We offer early years education for children aged 2 to 4 years. We follow the early education curriculum to support and develop children's learning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2025
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 June 2024: Standard registration
- ALL SAINTS PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Jeater | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Bedlow | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Evans | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Shaper | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Orchard | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Clarke | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Evans | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JUN 2024
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALL SAINTS CHURCH
SPRINGFIELD GREEN
CHELMSFORD
ESSEX
CM1 7HS
- Phone:
- 07518919352
- Email:
- allsaintspsch@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.