NEATH AND DISTRICT UNIT 388 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 524201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide young men and women (aged 10 to 18) with opportunities to participate in a wide variety of activities aimed at increasing fitness, team skills and building character, using the Roayl Navy as a model.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £21,830
Total expenditure: £13,430

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 May 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • T S ENCOUNTER (Working name)
  • NEATH & DISTRICT SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
  • NEATH AND DISTRICT SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
  • UNIT NO 388 SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Debbie Boyce Chair 23 October 2019
None on record
CHRISTOPHER JAMES Trustee 19 January 2023
None on record
Gareth Rice Trustee 19 January 2023
None on record
SARAH MARGARET DAVIES Trustee 19 January 2023
FRIENDS OF JERSEY PARK
Received: On time
BRITON FERRY COMMUNITY RESOURCE CENTRE
Charity reporting is overdue by 220 days
Daniella Louise Morris Trustee 22 January 2021
None on record
Ronald Bryn John Trustee 22 January 2021
YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION NEATH BRANCH
Received: On time
HEARTBEAT TRUST UK
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.69k £35.26k £16.39k £17.69k £21.83k
Total expenditure £30.23k £10.98k £31.32k £22.62k £13.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £200 £22.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
189 Old Road
NEATH
West Glamorgan
SA11 2ER
Phone:
07881951073