NELSON WORKMENS INSTITUTE AND LIBRARY
Charity Number: 524202
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 22 March 1965: Standard registration
- 26 April 2005: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 26 April 2005: Funds transferred to 1015581 THE COAL INDUSTRY SOCIAL WELFARE ORGANISATION
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 26 JANUARY 1945
Charitable objects
AN INSTITUTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF WORKMEN IN OR ABOUT COALMINES AND PARTICULARLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WORKERS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF NELSON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF NELSON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 18 APRIL 1929
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF WORKERS IN OR ABOUT COALMINES PARTICULARY THOSE IN THE PARISH OF LLANFABON
Area of benefit
NELSON-PARTICULARY THE PARISH OF LLANFABON
Registration history
- 22 March 1965 : Standard registration
- 26 April 2005 : Removed
- 26 April 2005 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window