PENCOED WELFARE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education & Training, Arts & Culture, Sports Recreation, Economic/Community/Development, Assisting other Charities Assisting with disabled groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bridgend
Governance
- 07 December 1967: Standard registration
- PENCOED MINER'S WELFARE AND COMMUNITY HALL (Working name)
- THE WELFARE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Luke Lee Fletcher | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Lewis | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy McDonald | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR John Alexander Thomas Williams | Trustee | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Judith Alyson Butcher | Trustee | 19 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR John Butcher | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.18k | £41.82k | £30.04k | £25.98k | £36.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.84k | £31.71k | £36.82k | £45.00k | £44.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.18k | £3.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 30TH APRIL 1965 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 10 FEBRUARY 1987
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SUCH FORMS OF RECREATION INCLUDING PHYSICAL EXERCISE OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION AS ARE CONDUCIVE TO THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIVING OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF PENCOED AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS ARE MEMBERS OF THE MINING COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
PENCOED AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pencoed Miners Welfare Hall
Heol-Y-Groes
Pencoed
BRIDGEND
Mid Glamorgan
CF35 5PE
- Phone:
- 01656861054
- Email:
- pencoedwelfare@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window