Trustees SWANSEA UNIT 331 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity Number: 524248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Davies Chair 03 November 2021
None on record
Caron Lee Flynn Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
James Springle Trustee 09 July 2024
None on record
Robert Denley Trustee 25 August 2022
None on record
Tom Orlando Cowles Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
Helen Short Trustee 11 September 2015
None on record