MARCOPOLO700 FOUNDATION LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the MarcoPolo700 Foundation is to promote inclusive access to education and digital technologies for Art and Cultural conservation. The Foundation organises events and exhibitions to make cultural heritage accessible to all. The organisation aims to foster intercultural dialogue and mutual understanding on a global level by highlighting shared cultural heritage and history.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- China
- India
- Indonesia
- Israel
- Italy
- Malaysia
- Singapore
- Turkey
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 14 October 2024: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hak Yung Peter YIP | Chair | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Francis Alexander PIESSE | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
FLORIAN EHRBAR | Trustee | 31 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee G Lam | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Graham Orchard | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Edinmore Gather | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Michael Adeson | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 OCT 2023 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 NOV 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION ABOUT THE LIFE OF MARCO POLO, INCLUDING HIS JOURNEY ALONG THE SILK ROAD, HIS LIFE ACHIEVEMENTS AND CONTRIBUTIONS TO WORLD TRADE AND CULTURAL EXCHANGE BY DELIVERING EXHIBITIONS, DISPLAYING ARTEFACTS, DISSEMINATING INFORMATION ONLINE, ASSISTING IN UNDERTAKING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY AWARDING GRANTS TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THEIR EDUCATION AT UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE, OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION OR FOR LIVING COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THEIR EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 1
3-7 Walpole Street
LONDON
SW3 4QP
- Phone:
- +852 28271162
- Email:
- contact@marcopolo700.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.