READ EASY WEST BERKSHIRE

Charity number: 1208918
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Teach over 18; living in West Berkshire;

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • West Berkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 July 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elaine Brichard Trustee 18 February 2025
None on record
Roger Allison Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
Dr Sarah Smart Trustee 12 March 2023
The Friends of Hungerford Primary School
Received: On time
Brian John Newman Trustee 12 January 2023
None on record
SALLY HARFIELD Trustee 12 January 2023
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
19 CLAREMONT CRESCENT
NEWBURY
RG14 2FF
Phone:
07710579534
Website:

westberkshirereadeasy.org.uk