WHITEFIELD METHODIST CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
Governance
- 27 August 2024: Standard registration
- 08 November 2024: Funds received from 1042772 STAND PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sally Ann Thornton | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lesley Joanne Harris | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL RICHARD THORNTON MIBS | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|||||
SYLVIA JOAN BULLAS | Trustee | 01 October 2006 |
|
|
||||
REV JOHN LAURENCE BULLAS | Trustee | 01 June 2006 |
|
|
||||
JEAN HANDLEY | Trustee | 01 October 2005 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Joanne Coleman | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Bethany Esther Thornton | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ashra Ramlogan | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Erica Jane Keith | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Wendy Richardson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gillian Carol Long | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Susan Garnett | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Enid Cathcart | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Elaine Muriel Quick | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Nicholas Leslie Coleman | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Craig Matthew Aspey | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Robert Douglas Cathcart | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jennifer Louise Aspey | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Clifford Young | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 26 OCT 1976
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITEFIELD METHODIST CHURCH
1 ELMS STREET
WHITEFIELD
MANCHESTER
M45 8GQ
- Phone:
- 01617679123
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.