Trustees THE GREEN

Charity number: 524284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HEILYN WILLIAMS Chair
DOLGELLAU INSTITUTE (KNOWN LOCALLY AS THE FREE LIBRARY)
Received: On time
Richard Jones Trustee 05 April 2022
DOLGELLAU INSTITUTE (KNOWN LOCALLY AS THE FREE LIBRARY)
Received: On time
Nia Smith Trustee 01 April 2021
DOLGELLAU INSTITUTE (KNOWN LOCALLY AS THE FREE LIBRARY)
Received: On time
BRANWEN RHYS DAFYDD Trustee 08 March 2016
DOLGELLAU INSTITUTE (KNOWN LOCALLY AS THE FREE LIBRARY)
Received: On time
YWAIN MYFYR Trustee 02 June 2015
None on record
BOB GUNTON Trustee 05 May 2015
DOLGELLAU INSTITUTE (KNOWN LOCALLY AS THE FREE LIBRARY)
Received: On time
Rev Tim Webb Trustee 18 November 2014
None on record
Jo Checkley Trustee 27 May 2014
DOLGELLAU INSTITUTE (KNOWN LOCALLY AS THE FREE LIBRARY)
Received: On time
JOHN CADAWALADR Trustee 03 December 2012
None on record
JOHN RAGHOOBAR Trustee
DOLGELLAU INSTITUTE (KNOWN LOCALLY AS THE FREE LIBRARY)
Received: On time
DYFRIG SIENCYN Trustee
None on record