OWAIN GLYNDWR MEMORIAL INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and maintain a Memorial Institute Building for the people of Glyndyfrdwy, Corwen and the surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,404 from 2 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Denbighshire
Governance
- 14 June 1966: Standard registration
- GLYNDYFRDWY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Rostron | Chair | 02 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Susan Williams | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rita Edwards | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Gaskell | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Elizabeth Edmondson | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Arthur Edmondson | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Jones | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Edward Barneby | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Fanson | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Jones | Trustee |
|
||||||
Arwyn Davies | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR CHRIS EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Delyth Ann Jones | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.21k | £13.02k | £9.31k | £14.60k | £13.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.58k | £3.74k | £4.87k | £17.26k | £10.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £9.60k | £5.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 October 2021 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 30 OCTOBER 1974 as amended on 01 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF GLYNDYFRDWY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. THE SAID LAND SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
GLYNDYFRDWY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Awel Y Mynydd
Glyndyfrdwy
CORWEN
LL21 9BP
- Phone:
- 07973130606
- Email:
- iampete@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
glyndyfrdwyvillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window