ARTHOG VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 524291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing a venue for social, sporting, educational, entertainment and similar activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £10,300
Total expenditure: £4,779

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Gwynedd

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 May 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Y GANOLFAN ARTHOG (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HILARY MARGARET MALYON Chair 09 April 2011
None on record
RHIAN LANGFORD Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
ELISABETH ELLIS Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Graham White Trustee 30 November 2020
None on record
HELEN BENEDICTE HOUGHTON-READE Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
BERYL LLOYD Trustee
None on record
JACQUELINE THOMAS Trustee
None on record
JEANETTE HARRIS Trustee
None on record
G W HUGHES Trustee
CYMDEITHAS HANES A CHOFNODION SIR FEIRIONNYDD
Received: On time
DR DANIEL WILLIAMS' EDUCATIONAL FUND
Received: On time
MRS C LLOYD Trustee
None on record
LLINOS BETHAN EDWARDS Trustee
None on record
JANET SUSAN ELLIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.46k £15.13k £5.74k £7.21k £10.30k
Total expenditure £6.22k £6.86k £8.77k £4.30k £4.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Y BWTHYN GWYN
ARTHOG
LL39 1YU
Phone:
01341250108
Website:

No information available