NEUADD BENTREF LLANUWCHLLYN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rheoli a chynnal Neuadd Bentref Llanuwchllyn fel adnodd cymunedol i'r ardal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 10 December 1965: Standard registration
- LLANUWCHLLYN VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUW A EDWARDS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Branwen Haf Williams | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Osian Huw Williams | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nest Wyn Luck | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Parchg Carwyn Leonard Sidney Siddall | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sion Aran Jones | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
SION LLEWELYN | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Iolo Gwyn Jones | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
GWYNETH PARRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWINA JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.92k | £26.51k | £34.22k | £32.60k | £16.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.60k | £16.58k | £12.15k | £59.89k | £13.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £750 | £23.75k | £10.37k | £21.75k | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 28 NOVEMBER 1958. TRUST DEED DATED 7 MAY 1960.
Charitable objects
"UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF LLANUWCHLLYN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITIACL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS".
Area of benefit
LLANUWCHLLYN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ty Newydd
Llangower
Bala
LL23 7DA
- Phone:
- 07507 117915
- Email:
- nestwynluck@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window