TREOWEN AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides buildings/facilities/open space
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,330 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 24 May 1972: Standard registration
- THE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- TREOWEN AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY AND SOCIAL CENTRE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mandy Mitchell | Chair | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Susan Kay Thomas | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Linda Prosser | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Bebb | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Edwards | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Edwards | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Williams | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN MARY ROGERS | Trustee | 01 May 1988 |
|
|
||||
PHYLLIS MAY JENKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/03/2020 | 11/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.19k | £26.06k | £7.94k | £8.49k | £14.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.84k | £13.78k | £4.44k | £6.65k | £8.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £24.00k | N/A | N/A | £2.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED 27 MARCH 1972
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF TREOWEN AND DISTRICT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
TREOWEN AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 FFLORENS ROAD
NEWBRIDGE
NEWPORT
NP11 3ED
- Phone:
- 01495246047
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window