QUEERWELL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are the national community led mental health charity for people aged 18 and over who Identify as LGBTQ plus. We exist to help prevent suicide, self-harm, and poor mental health within the community by providing a unique mix of mental health and wellness support free or at low cost, including therapy, coaching, workshops and playshops. We prioritise those in most need with least resources.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 September 2024: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Femi Otitoju | Chair | 31 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grainne Carroll | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sean Pettit-Scheepers | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mario Muttenthaler | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Henry James Llwellyn Ashcroft | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Richards | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Toksvig | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Sep 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 1) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF LGBTQ+ PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, 1 TO 1, GROUP WORK AND IN PERSON OR ONLINE COACHING AND THERAPY SESSIONS, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO THE MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF LGBTQ+ PEOPLE; AND 2) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY A) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE SPECIFIC CHALLENGES FACED BY LGBTQ+ PEOPLE WHEN ACCESSING MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES B) CHALLENGING DISCRIMINATION AGAINST LGBTQ+ PEOPLE WITHIN MENTAL HEALTH SETTINGS NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
Devonshire House
582 Honeypot Lane
Stanmore
Middelsex
HA7 1JS
- Phone:
- 07734656148
- Email:
- admin@queerwell.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.