GARN-YR-ERW WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Games Room, Training/meeting room User Groups/Activities, Childrens Activities, Snooker/Pool/Table Tennis, Bingo, Scouts, private hire, table top sales and summer play scheme
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 03 May 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE MARY REED | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Heather Morgan | Trustee | 04 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Redman | Trustee | 21 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jody Edmunds | Trustee | 21 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK KIERAN EDMUNDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET SUSAN EDMUNDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £943 | £10.11k | £16.52k | £956 | £116 | |
|
Total expenditure | £288 | £346 | £15.93k | £527 | £650 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 06 July 2023 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 11 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A WELFARE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
GARN-YR-ERW AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 LOWER GARN TERRACE
GARN YR ERW
BLAENAVON
PONTYPOOL
NP4 9SF
- Phone:
- 01495790381
- Email:
- janet_hen@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window