Accounts and annual returns LANGSTONE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 524345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late Download Open in new window