LLANHENNOCK CLUB AND READING ROOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides an attractive venue for Community Council Meetings, Village Hall Committee Meetings, Llanhennock Ladies Meetings, Yoga Classes, Art Club, and for private parties. Also used for occasional entertainment, social evenings, and church events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 30 May 1975: Standard registration
- LLANHENNOCK VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Neil Statham | Chair | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Faulkner | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sabine Gahan | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Baird | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Parish | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Debra Davies | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kath Gwatkin | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elen Statham | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|||||
MARJORIE ELIZABETH POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.11k | £1.76k | £1.57k | £3.44k | £5.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.97k | £1.67k | £1.85k | £4.32k | £5.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 February 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 February 2023 | 386 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 February 2023 | 751 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 27 OCTOBER 1920 AS VALIDATED BY THE CHARITABLE TRUST (VALIDATION) ACT 1954 as amended on 18 Nov 2023as amended on 18 Nov 2023as amended on 19 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LLANHENNCOK.
Area of benefit
LLANHENNOCK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Llanhennock Village Hall
Llanhennock
NEWPORT
Gwent
NP18 1LT
- Phone:
- 01633420307
- Email:
- llanhennockvh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window