SGMF-INTRA MENTAL HEALTH TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting SGMF, a mental health foundation in Armenia, and promoting understanding of mental health issues.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Armenia
- Cyprus
Governance
- 24 September 2024: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANA KATSOURIS | Chair | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Chraghatssi-Banian | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Annie Khenian | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katerina Charalambous | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Katsouris | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY (’THE OBJECTS') IS: THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES IN ARMENIA BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO SELECTED CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS IN THE FIELD OF MENTAL HEALTH FURTHERING THIS CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 CHATSWORTH ROAD
LONDON
6 CHATSWORTH ROAD
W5 3DB
W5 3DB
- Phone:
- 07956251870
- Email:
- dianakatsouris@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.