PELHAM HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General social, educational and sport facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £28,909 from 5 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 26 July 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antonia Pearson | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Scarr | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Morgan | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Brian Northedge | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Richards | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Henstridge | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Bristow | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tom Rigby | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Lancelot Rowell | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH J HAEFFNER | Trustee | 07 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
David James May | Trustee | 03 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.73k | £19.97k | £15.69k | £44.04k | £67.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.62k | £29.51k | £18.53k | £33.82k | £47.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.34k | £13.00k | N/A | £3.35k | £28.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 05/05/1965 AS AMENDED ON 02/02/2015 as amended on 14 May 2018 as amended on 12 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF PENALT IN THE COUNTY OF MONMOUTH (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE SAID PARISH") AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF PENALT AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pelham Hall
Penallt
MONMOUTH
Gwent
NP25 4AH
- Phone:
- 07748950207
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window