Financial history TORFAEN UNIT 508 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 524374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.54k £18.02k £4.22k £14.00k £15.38k
Total expenditure £4.24k £3.09k £15.94k £17.71k £16.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A