BASSETLAW FOODBANK

Charity number: 1209747
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of services to the people of Bassetlaw who are experience hardship and poverty. We provide 7 day emergency food parcels for those in crisis. We operate a mobile shop in the rural areas of Bassetlaw. We operate a lunch club in the Harworth and Bircotes area. We operate a community cafe in Worksop. We run a fruit and veg box scheme and have an allotment project in Manton.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 August 2024: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEVIN DUKES Chair 12 January 2021
THE BARBARA CURTIS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
BASSETLAW FOOD BANK
Received: On time
Rebecca Cullen Trustee 21 February 2023
BASSETLAW FOOD BANK
Received: On time
Malcolm Lane-Ley Trustee 11 October 2022
BASSETLAW FOOD BANK
Received: On time
Christine Oldfield Trustee 09 August 2022
BASSETLAW FOOD BANK
Received: On time
WEST GATE BENEVOLENT TRUST
Received: On time
Emily Hoe-Crook Trustee 16 June 2022
THE CROSSING CHURCH (METHODIST & UNITED REFORMED)
Received: On time
BASSETLAW FOOD BANK
Received: On time
Karen Whitlam Trustee 14 January 2020
BASSETLAW FOOD BANK
Received: On time
Kathy Cowbrough Trustee 12 June 2019
None on record
ROBERT LAMB Trustee 13 June 2018
THE RETFORD CIVIC SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
BASSETLAW FOOD BANK
SHREWSBURY ROAD
WORKSOP
S80 2TU
Phone:
01909473078